This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/13/2021 at 19:07:45 (UTC).

THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr vs A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tesche Arkin, Caroline, Farfante, D. Darren and Farfante, Darren. D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9613

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Farfante, D. Darren

Farfante, Darren. D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

Miami, FL 33131

Estate Plaintiff

THRASH, HOWARD M, Sr

Miami, FL 33131

Defendants

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

CRANE CO.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.,

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

100 Four Daniel Drive

Greenville, SC 29607

TECO ENERGY, INC.

702 N Franklin St

Tampa, FL 33602

ALFA LAVAL, INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

155 Federal Street Suite 700

Boston, MA 02110

DEZURIK, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

ELLIOTT CO., a/k/a ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO.

Plantation, FL 33324

FLOWSERVE US INC.,

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JOHN CRANE, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

DAP PRODUCTS, INC.

1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

INGERSOLL-RAND INDUSTRIAL U.S., INC.

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

One Independent Drive Ste 2301

Jacksonville, FL 32202

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

11380 Prosperity Farms Road #221-E

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUNEN , MARC PHILLIP

Attorney at THE FERRARO LAW FIRM, P.A.

600 Brickell Ave Fl 38

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

BROTMAN , KENN

Attorney at K&L GATES

70 W Madison St Ste 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

CACHALDORA , AMANDA RAE

Attorney at BICE COLE LAW FIRM, PL

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

GODWIN , EDDIE GLENWOOD

Attorney at LAU LANE PIEPER ET AL

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

KOLOS , CHRIS NICK

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

200 S Orange Ave Ste 2600

Orlando, FL 32801

IOVINO , CAROLINE MARIE

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMEREY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

GUADAGNOLO , RICHARD DAVID, II

Attorney at STONE, GLASS& CONNOLLY, LLP

18001 Old Cutler Rd Ste 457

Palmetto Bay, FL 33157

REDDIN, JOHN CHARLES

Attorney at LUKS SANTANIELLO PETRILLO & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130-1560

SELMAN , STEPHANIE MARGARITA

Attorney at MANNING GROSS+ MASSENBURG, LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 1400

Miami, FL 33131

KIBBE , REBECCA CARRIE

Attorney at MANNING GROSS + MASSENBURG LLP

701 Brickell Ave Ste 2000

Miami, FL 33131

TOMLIN , TRACY EDWARD

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

301 S College St Fl 23

Charlotte, NC 28202

COLLINGS , CHRISTOPHER JAMES MORE

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

701 Brickell Ave Fl 17

Miami, FL 33131

Other Attorneys

COHEN , STUART LANCE

Attorney at LUKS, SANTANIELLO, PETRILLO, & COHEN

150 W Flagler St Ste 2600

Miami, FL 33130

MCCUTCHEON , CAITLYN R.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS, LLP

600 Brickell Ave Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131

MERCER , DAVID A

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

04/15/2021: CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/01/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/26/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/01/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/28/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/01/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/28/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/28/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

01/21/2021: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FLOWSERVE US INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: ALFA LAVAL, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FMC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
213 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THRASH, HOWARD M, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGERSOLL-RAND INDUSTRIAL U.S., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEZURIK, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant