This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/19/2022 at 06:49:50 (UTC).

THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER,Gagne, Rebecca vs USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 THORPE CHIROPRACTIC REHAB CENTER,Gagne, Rebecca filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5307

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Gagne, Rebecca

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent, 200 East Gains St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

PLAZA RIOS , YOLANDA

Attorney at ROIG LAWYERS

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 13500

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/12/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/12/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/12/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/13/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/13/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

08/12/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/01/2022: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/01/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

09/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

09/09/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/12/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THORPE CHIROPRACTIC & REHAB CENTER, is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Plaza Rios, Yolanda