This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/24/2020 at 19:18:21 (UTC).

THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY vs COLEMAN JR, NELSON

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 THOMPSON THOMPSON REALTY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against COLEMAN JR, NELSON. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0351

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

COLEMAN JR, NELSON

Tampa, FL 33611

COLEMAN, MARGO

Tampa, FL 33611

 

Court Documents

ORDER

07/31/2020: ORDER

MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

07/28/2020: MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/28/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ANSWER

07/22/2020: ANSWER

AMENDED COMPLAINT

07/13/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

07/10/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: TEMPORARY EMERGENCY ORDER FOR (LANDLORD TENANT AND FORECLOSURES); Additional Info: Date 2: 07/31/2020; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Defendant: COLEMAN, MARGO; Date Served: 07/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVICE; Comment: ON 7/14/2020 TO MARGO COLEMAN; Additional Info: Defendant: COLEMAN JR, NELSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR IMMEDIATE DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Defendant: COLEMAN JR, NELSON; Defendant: COLEMAN, MARGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: UNEXECUTED; Additional Info: Defendant: COLEMAN JR, NELSON; Defendant: COLEMAN, MARGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THOMPSON & THOMPSON REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less