This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/08/2019 at 10:44:11 (UTC).

THOMPSON, ANGELA H vs THOMPSON, WILLIE

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 THOMPSON, ANGELA H filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against THOMPSON, WILLIE. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HINSON, CARL C. and Hinson, C.. Carl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0208

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HINSON, CARL C.

Hinson, C.. Carl

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THOMPSON, ANGELA H

Tampa, FL 33605

Respondent

THOMPSON, WILLIE

Tampa, FL 33605

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMONS , JAMIE VAN LEAR

Attorney at PILKA AND ASSOCIATES

213 Providence Rd

Brandon, FL 33511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H; Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Comment: (WITH MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ATTACHED); Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H; Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE; Signed: 02/06/2019; Judicial Officer: Hinson, Carl C.; Vol./Book: 26403, Page: 846, Number of Pages: 846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ORDER CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: CMC; Additional Info: Date Signed: 02/05/2019; Judicial Officer: Hinson, Carl C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • ANSWER AND WAIVER; Additional Info: Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER; Additional Info: Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: THOMPSON, WILLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: JAMIE V. SIMONS, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF THE PETITIONER; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: THOMPSON, ANGELA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 400 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: HINSON, CARL C.

    Read MoreRead Less