This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/09/2019 at 07:13:27 (UTC).

Third Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland vs Jackson, Julius

Case Summary

On 10/27/2014 Third Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jackson, Julius. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kiser, D. Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0828

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kiser, D. Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Third Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland

5110 Eisenhower Blvd., Suite 302A

Tampa, FL 33634

Defendants

Any and all unknown parties

Unknown, FL 00000

City Of Tampa

Tampa, FL 33602

Jackson, Julius

Tampa, FL 33605

Jackson, Michelle

Tampa, FL 33605

Tenant 1

Tampa, FL 33605

FIRST ACCEPTANCE INSURANCE CO

CLERK OF THE COURTS HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY FL

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EVAN C LEACH, Esquire

ST. LOUIS , VLADIMIR R

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Po Box 7443

Tallahassee, FL 32314

LEACH , EVAN CHRISTOPHER

Attorney at LEACH LAW LLC

540 Main St Ste 8

Hyannis, MA 02601

Defendant Attorneys

MUELLER , ERNEST

Attorney at OFFICE OF CITY ATTORNEY

315 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602-5211

BOHNER , DALE KENT

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO CLERK OF THE COURT

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602-4932

 

Court Documents

BID INFORMATION SHEET

01/30/2017: BID INFORMATION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

06/28/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/24/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

03/15/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/15/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/29/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/18/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING

COMPLAINT

10/27/2014: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SALE

12/29/2016: NOTICE OF SALE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

05/26/2016: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/25/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/24/2016: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF FILING

04/12/2016: NOTICE OF FILING

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/23/2016: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/01/2016: AMENDED COMPLAINT

RESPONSE

06/17/2015: RESPONSE

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER; Comment: RETURNED ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE TO- VAN NESS LAW FIRM PLC 1239 E NEWPORT CENTER DRIVE SUITE 110 DEERFIELD BEACH, FLORIDA 33442 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER (AO S-2015-O49 07/15) ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Third Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Comment: FROM CFO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • BID INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Fee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2014
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • Judgment Code: FJFC; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE; Instrument Number: 2016432771; Judge: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THIRD FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION OF CLEVELAND is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOHNER , DALE KENT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER , ERNEST