This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 06/16/2023 at 04:48:14 (UTC).

The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc vs Valentin, Angel

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Valentin, Angel. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle, Schultz-Kin, Leslie, Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8566

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc

Defendant

Valentin, Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASMER , NIURKA FERNANDEZ

Defendant Attorney

TANCREDO , CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/19/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

07/20/2021: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/20/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/19/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/20/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

03/25/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

02/25/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/23/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/23/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE

02/23/2022: NOTICE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

01/21/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Cancelled Comments: Request of the Party ATTY; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Valentin, Angel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Valentin, Angel;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: The Westwood Homeowners Association Of Walden Lake Inc;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less