Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/21/2021 at 08:16:26 (UTC).

THE MORRIS REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 THE MORRIS REVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1279

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

MORRIS, NICHOLE LOUISE

Jacksonville, FL 32222

JOHNCHUCK, MICHELLE

Qyubct, FL 32351

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Kevin Johnson, Pres And Ceo Attn: Rig001 6801 E Hillsborough Avenue

Tampa, FL 33610

MORRIS, BRYAN EDWARD

Cosby, TN 37722

THE MORRIS REVOCABLE TRUST

Decedent

MORRIS, STEPHEN EDWARD

Not Classified By Court and Trustee

MORRIS, BRYAN EDWARD

Cosby, TN 37722

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

EPPERSON , JOEL RODMAN

Attorney at EPPERSON & RICH, PLLC

8401 J R Manor Dr Ste 100

Tampa, FL 33634

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketTRUST NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketFEE LETTER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: HILLSBOROUGH COIUNTY CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISION CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOVERSHEET; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 1/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketREQUEST; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV - 1/28/2021 FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV - 1/28/2021 E- FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 1/28/2021 E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPET TO DET HOMESTEAD; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 1/28/2021 (COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 1/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 2/16/2021 OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 2/23/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 3/18/2021 FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 3/18/2021 FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWAIVER; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 3/18/2021 CONSENT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV 4/8/2021 FOR AMENDED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV MICHELE JOHNCHUCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS; Comment: CIRCUIT CIVIL DIV SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bryan Edward Morris, as Trustee of the Morris Revocable Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EPPERSON , JOEL RODMAN