This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/10/2020 at 14:53:54 (UTC).

The Dissolution of the Marriage of:MICHAUD, BELEN and MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 The Dissolution of the Marriage of MICHAUD, BELEN and MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tibbals, D. Wesley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7820

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tibbals, D. Wesley

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER

Tampa, FL 33613

MICHAUD, BELEN

Riverview, FL 33578

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL NO SHOW (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN; Petitioner: MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER; Date Signed: 02/11/2020; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING WITHOUT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 01/08/2020; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; Comment: ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING WITHOUT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR 01/08/2020 AT 9:30 AM TIME RESERVED: MATTER TO BE HEARD: SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING WITHOUT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN; Petitioner: MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER; Date Signed: 12/10/2019; Judicial Officer: Tibbals, Wesley D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN; Petitioner: MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket12 RULES OF COURTROOM BEHAVIOR; Additional Info: Petitioner: MICHAUD, BELEN; Petitioner: MICHAUD, KENNETH CHRISTOPHER

    Read MoreRead Less