This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/07/2019 at 06:54:53 (UTC).

The Dissolution of the Marriage of:FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO and ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 The Dissolution of the Marriage of FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO and ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9161

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, .. Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO

Tampa, FL 33619

ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

Tampa, FL 33619

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS; Vol./Book: 26741, Page: 1162, Number of Pages: 1162

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2019
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING WITHOUT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Date Signed: 04/07/2019; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketORDER ON - TO - FOR (FAMILY); Comment: PENDING DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Date Signed: 03/01/2019; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: FINAL W/O PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Date 2: 12/20/2018; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS; Petitioner: FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS; Petitioner: FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNON-LAWYER DISCLOSURE FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: FORTY, LUIS ALBERTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: ARCO HERNANDEZ, YANELIS

    Read MoreRead Less