This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 01/16/2021 at 15:33:12 (UTC).

The Dissolution of the Marriage of: CHICOINE, TIMOTHY ALLEN and CHICOINE, JOANN MARIE

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 The Dissolution of the Marriage of CHICOINE, TIMOTHY ALLEN and CHICOINE, JOANN MARIE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Marlewski, Ann .. Christine and Marlewski, Christine. Ann .. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5150

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Marlewski, Ann .. Christine

Marlewski, Christine. Ann .

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CHICOINE, TIMOTHY ALLEN

Gibsonton, FL 33534

CHICOINE, JOANN MARIE

Plant City, FL 33563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: CHICOINE, JOANN MARIE; Petitioner: CHICOINE, TIMOTHY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (FAMILY); Additional Info: Petitioner: CHICOINE, TIMOTHY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: CHICOINE, TIMOTHY ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Additional Info: Petitioner: CHICOINE, JOANN MARIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCOURT INTERPRETER DETERMINATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDH513 FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less