This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/28/2022 at 09:55:23 (UTC).

THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS,Garry, Sandi vs AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES DISORDERS,Garry, Sandi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0404

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garry, Sandi

Sunrise, FL 33323

THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

BATISTA , DAVID O

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

200 E Broward Blvd Ste 2100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/03/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/03/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/03/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/06/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/06/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/14/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/24/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

10/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

10/24/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/24/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garry, Sandi; Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garry, Sandi; Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garry, Sandi; Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garry, Sandi; Plaintiff: THE CENTER FOR ORTHOPAEDIC INJURIES & DISORDERS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less