This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/19/2019 at 19:47:58 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs WALLACE, CARL F

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WALLACE, CARL F. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1491

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Kelley Kronenberg, 8201 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324-3267

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE CATHERINE I. WALLACE

Valrico, FL 33594

AMERICAN EXPRESS TRAVEL RELATED SERVICES COMPANY INC

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Valrico, FL 33594

JACARANDA LLC, A NEW MEXICO LLC AS TRUSTEE

2587 Camino Chueco

Santa Fe, NM 87505

UNKNOWN SPOUSE CARL F. WALLACE

Valrico, FL 33594

JACARANDA LLC, A NEW MEXICO LLC

2587 Camino Chueco

Santa Fe, NM 87505

WALLACE, CARL F

Valrico, FL 33594

OTTOBRUC ENTERPRISES, LLC

Skip Trace

Skip, FL 12345

RHC HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

3174 Gulf Of Mexico Dr

Longboat Key, FL 34228

WALLACE, CATHERINE I

Valrico, FL 33594

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Valrico, FL 33594

CAPITAL ONE BANK

2001 Maywill St.

Richmond, VA 23230

RHC MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC.

1801 North Highland Avenue

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANILYAN , IRINA

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

10360 W State Road 84

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

LENOIR , IVAN THADDEUS, II

Attorney at THE LENOIR LAW FIRM

502 N Armenia Ave

Tampa, FL 33609-1703

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/21/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/11/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

08/30/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/04/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/25/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/21/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/12/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/11/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JACARANA LLC NEW MEXICO LLC AS TRUSTEE SECRETARY OF STATE 9/27/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: OTTOBRUC ENTERPRISES LLC 9-12-19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RHC HOA INC, 9-12-19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JACARANDA LLC 9-12-19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: IVAN LENOIR, ESQ. ATTORNEY FOR CARL F. WALLACE 502 N. ARMENIA AVENUE FORT MYERS, FL 33907; Additional Info: Defendant: WALLACE, CARL F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: JACARANDA LLC, A NEW MEXICO LLC, AS TRUSTEE (LAST KNOWN ADDRESS) C/O SOMERSET SYSTEMS LLC, REGISTERED AGENT 2587 CAMINO CHUECO SANTA FE, NM 87505; Additional Info: Defendant: JACARANDA LLC, A NEW MEXICO LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: JACARANDA LLC A NEW MEXICO LLC (LAST KNOWN ADDRESS) C/O SOMERSET SYSTEMS LLC, REGISTERED AGENT 2587 CAMINO CHUECO SANTA FE, NM 87505; Additional Info: Defendant: JACARANDA LLC, A NEW MEXICO LLC AS TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO; Comment: RHC HOME OWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC. C/O BETH CALLANS, REGISTERED AGENT, JMC PROP MGMT. 3174 GULF OF MEXICO DR. LONGBOAT KEY, FL 34228; Additional Info: Defendant: RHC HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less