This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/23/2020 at 07:47:26 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs SIMONE, DEVON T

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SIMONE, DEVON T. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Battles, L. Emmett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1602

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Battles, L. Emmett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Kelley Kronenberg, 8201 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324-3267

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN SPOUSE DEVON T. SIMONE

Riverview, FL 33578

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY CENTRAL GOVT DEP

Tampa, FL 33602

SOUTH POINTE OF TAMPA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

400 North Ashley Drive, Suite 2020

Tampa, FL 33602

CLERK OF COURT FOR THE 13TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

800 East Twiggs Street

Tampa, FL 33602

SIMONE, DEVON T

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Riverview, FL 33578

BUSH, RYAN M

Riverview, FL 33578

MERS, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN SPOUSE RYAN M. BUSH

Riverview, FL 33578

HUNTER'S POINTE REALTY CORP

Skip Trace

Skip, FL 12345

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARRA , MARC ANTHONY

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

10360 W State Road 84

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

GLAUSIER , CHARLES EVANS, Esquire

Attorney at GLAUSIER KNIGHT, PLLC

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2020

Tampa, FL 33602-4311

GLAUSIER , CHARLES EVANS

Attorney at GLAUSIER KNIGHT JONES, PLLC

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2020

Tampa, FL 33602

HACHEY , STEPHEN KYLE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEPHEN K. HACHEY, P.A.

10853 Boyette Rd

Riverview, FL 33569

 

Court Documents

Disclaimer of Interest

03/08/2019: Disclaimer of Interest

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/25/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/25/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

02/13/2019: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/13/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/13/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/13/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

09/23/2019: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

08/30/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/21/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

02/18/2019: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

02/13/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/13/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/13/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING; Comment: WITHDRAWAL AS DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS, DEVON T. SIMONE AND BRIAN BARGO 10/28/19 ELB; Additional Info: Defendant: SIMONE, DEVON T; Date Signed: 10/28/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAWL AS DEFENDANTS COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: SIMONE, DEVON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAWL AS DEFENDANTS COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: SIMONE, DEVON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW; Comment: MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AS DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL WITH CONSENT; Additional Info: Defendant: SIMONE, DEVON T; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Defendant: SIMONE, DEVON T; Defendant: UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Comment: DEF; Additional Info: Defendant: SIMONE, DEVON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S- AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TME; ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to ensure service of this Order on all interested parties. JUDGE E.L.BATT; Additional Info: Date 2: 08/09/2019; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less