This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/30/2020 at 08:36:20 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs RHEA, LAURA J

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RHEA, LAURA J. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nielsen, A. Richard and Judge, Presiding. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1634

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nielsen, A. Richard

Judge, Presiding

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

C/O Lender Legal Services, Llc 201 E. Pine St. Ste. 730

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendants

GASKINS, JAMES O

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of Rebecca R. Prior

Tampa, FL 33612

United States of America, Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service

Washington, DC 20224

RHEA, CARLOS D

Tampa, FL 33612

Clerk of Court in and for Hillsborough County, Florida

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of James O. Gaskins

Tampa, FL 33612

RHEA, CHARLES V

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of Thetis E. Gaskins

Tampa, FL 33612

RHEA, LAURA J

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of Laura J Rhea

Tampa, FL 33612

State Of Florida

Tallahassee, FL 32399

GASKINS, THETIS E

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Tenant #2

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Tenant #1

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of Charles V. Rhea

Tampa, FL 33612

PRIOR, REBECCA R

Tampa, FL 33612

Unknown Spouse of Carlos D. Rhea

Tampa, FL 33612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUGGERIO , JASON KYLE

Attorney at LENDER LEGAL PLLC

201 E Pine St Ste 730

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

BOHNER , DALE KENT

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO. CLERK OF THE CIR

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602

COHEN , HARRY MICHAEL

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH CO. CLERK OF THE CIR

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 13

Tampa, FL 33602

DUNN , MARK S

Attorney at FLORIDA OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

3745 Lifford Cir

Tallahassee, FL 32309

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

11/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES

DISCLAIMER

04/01/2019: DISCLAIMER

ORDER ON

08/15/2019: ORDER ON

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/14/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/14/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/14/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/14/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

05/07/2019: COPY OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND PLEADINGS MAILED TO

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/11/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER OF DEFAULT

08/17/2019: ORDER OF DEFAULT

ANSWER

04/11/2019: ANSWER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/26/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/26/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/14/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/14/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RESET FORECLOSURE SALE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING REOPEN FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO RESCHEDULE-RESET SALE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JUDICIAL SALE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketJUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE; Comment: LA GACETA; Additional Info: Date of Sale: 04/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less