This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/03/2019 at 23:15:19 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1331

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Kelley Kronenberg, 8201 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324-3267

Defendants

BARRIENTOS, MARIA HOLANDA

Tampa, FL 33610

DISCOVER BANK

6500 New Albany Rd. E.

New Albany, OH 43054

MERS, INC., AS NOMINEE FOR DECISION ONE MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

1901 E. Voorhees Street, Suite C

Danville, IL 61843

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Tampa, FL 33610

CLERK OF COURT FOR THE 13TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

800 E. Twiggs Street

Tampa, FL 33602

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

9927 Delaney Lake Dr.

Tampa, FL 33619

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Tampa, FL 33610

UNKNOWN SPOUSE MARIA HOLANDA BARRIENTOS

Tampa, FL 33610

CHASE BANK, USA, N.A.

1191 East Newport Center Drive, Suite 101

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

UNKNOWN SPOUSE JUAN PABLO HERNANDEZ

Tampa, FL 33610

HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO

Tampa, FL 33610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARRA , MARC ANTHONY

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

10360 W State Road 84

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

RODRIGUEZ ROKUSEK, CLARA, Esquire

Attorney at ROKUSEK LAW, P.A.

1211 N. Westshore Blvd, Suite 411

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/05/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/04/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/01/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/06/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/06/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

05/15/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

DISCLAIMER

03/04/2019: DISCLAIMER

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

04/16/2019: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE

04/09/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF AVOIDANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/07/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

03/01/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/06/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Additional Info: Defendant: HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketBORROWERS REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE IN RMFM; Additional Info: Defendant: HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketORDER ON; Comment: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY TO MAKE MORE DEFINTE AND CERTAIN PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT **DENIED** 10/15/19 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: HERNANDEZ, JUAN PABLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONCOMPLIANCE WITH RMFM PROGRAM- NOT ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S- DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF NON-REPRESENTATION IN MEDIATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF NON-REPRESENTATION IN MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2019298386; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTY; Instrument Number: 2019244382; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less