This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/15/2020 at 18:44:50 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs CEBALLOS, SERGIO R

Case Summary

On 02/12/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CEBALLOS, SERGIO R. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Cook, J.. Martha. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1523

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Cook, J.. Martha

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Kelley Kronenberg, 8201 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324-3267

Defendants

CEBALLOS, SERGIO R

Tampa, FL 33615

UNKNOWN SPOUSE SERGIO R. CEBALLOS

Tampa, FL 33615

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

Tampa, FL 33615

COPPERFIELD TOWNHOMES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

1801 North Highland Avenue

Tampa, FL 33602

UNKNOWN SPOUSE ROSA E. BARRABI

Tampa, FL 33634

BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

18619 Us Hwy 41 North

Lutz, FL 33549

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Tampa, FL 33615

CITIBANK, N.A.

701 East 60Th Street North

Sioux Falls, SD 57117

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

101 N. Phillips Avenue

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

BARRABI, ROSA E

Tampa, FL 33634

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANILYAN , IRINA

Attorney at KELLEY KRONENBERG

10360 W State Road 84

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33324

Defendant Attorneys

ROSIN , SCOTT AARON

Attorney at SCOTT A ROSIN, PA

5835 Memorial Hwy Ste 6

Tampa, FL 33615-5005

MELTON, H WEBSTER, III

Attorney at BUSH ROSS, P.A.

P O Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

MELTON , HOWELL WEBSTER, III

Attorney at BUSH ROSS P.A.

Po Box 3913

Tampa, FL 33601

LEVINE , BRYAN BENJAMIN

Attorney at KNOX LEVINE, P.A.

36354 Us Highway 19 N

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

HUDSON , IAN PATRICK

Attorney at KING HUDSON - PLLC

360 Central Ave Ste 800

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/12/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

02/26/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/12/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE

03/20/2019: NOTICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/21/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/21/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/19/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER

02/19/2019: ANSWER

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/13/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/12/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/12/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL; Comment: FOR DEFT; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION; Date Signed: 03/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION; Comment: MOTION TO DISMISS 03/25/20 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION; Date 2: 03/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: ON 03/18/20 AT 10:30 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR COUNSEL SUBSTITUTION; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL; Comment: AS TO DEFT BLACK POINT; Additional Info: Defendant: BLACK POINT ASSETS II, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION; Date Signed: 10/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less