This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/28/2020 at 04:47:23 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON vs Bonenberger, Barbara S

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Bonenberger, Barbara S. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily and Judge, Presiding. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1812

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Judge, Presiding

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

C/O Brian L. Rosaler 1701 W. Hillsboro Blvd. Suite 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

Defendants

All Other Unknown Parties

Tampa, FL 33605

Spang, Timothy R

Lake Ranch, FL 34202

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #1

Tampa, FL 33605

Unknown Spouse of Barbara S. Bonenberger

Wheeling, WV 26003

Unknown Spouse of Rita Shaw

Medina, OH 44256

Unknown Spouse of Timothy R. Spang

Lake Ranch, FL 34202

Spang, John F

Columbus, OH 43212

Unknown Tenant(s) in Possession #2

Tampa, FL 33605

Unknown Spouse of John F. Spang

Columbus, OH 43212

Shaw, Rita

Medina, OH 44256

Bonenberger, Barbara S

Wheeling, WV 26003

Suntrust Bank

C/O Corporation Service Company, Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Not Classified By Court

TOP AFFORDABLE REAL ESTATE, LLC

P. O. Box 2290

Tampa, FL 33601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COHN, RICHARD P, Esquire

Attorney at POPKIN & ROSALER, P.A.

1701 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-1572

COHN , RICHARD PAUL

Attorney at POPKIN & ROSALER, P.A.

1701 W Hillsboro Blvd Ste 400

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442-1572

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/13/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/16/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/27/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/21/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/21/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

02/19/2019: LIS PENDENS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/19/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/19/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/19/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/14/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/07/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

04/09/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/08/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/08/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/08/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/21/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

02/19/2019: VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/19/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • HearingMORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Judge, Presiding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: GOOD FAITH DEPOSIT $ 6,480.00; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: TOP AFFORDABLE REAL ESTATE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketBID INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketFee Worksheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDEPOSIT IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE ACCOUNT; Comment: BALANCE PAID $ 124,027.20 + CLERK FEES $ 1,951.50 + DOC STAMPS $ 907.20; Additional Info: Successful Bidder: TOP AFFORDABLE REAL ESTATE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less