Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/11/2021 at 18:06:02 (UTC).

Td Bank Usa, N.a. vs Johnson, Morris M

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Td Bank Usa, N a filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Johnson, Morris M. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott, M. Monique, Scott, Monique. M and Scott, Monique M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6742

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Scott, M. Monique

Scott, Monique. M

Scott, Monique M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Td Bank Usa, N.a. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Td Bank Usa, N.a.

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Target National Bank

Defendant

Johnson, Morris M

Tampa, FL 33606-1733

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORNARO , MATTHEW

Attorney at MATTHEW FORNARO, P.A.

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 200

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

03/25/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/19/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/18/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/18/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 312 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Scott, Monique M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 03/24/2021 DEFT. MORRIS M. JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson, Morris M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TARGET NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW