Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/25/2021 at 23:58:55 (UTC).

Td Bank Usa, N.a vs Greer, Linda S

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Td Bank Usa, N a filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Greer, Linda S. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8822

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Td Bank Usa, N.a. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

TARGET NATIONAL BANK

Td Bank Usa, N.a

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

Greer, Linda S

Brandon, FL 33511-6239

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD , IASIA BAQUEL

Attorney at IASIA B. WARD

1001 N Dixie Hwy

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

03/25/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/24/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/24/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 304 3RD FL 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021186727; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Greer, Linda S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Td Bank Usa, N.a

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TARGET NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ward, Iasia B