This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/28/2019 at 19:51:51 (UTC).

TD BANK, N.A. vs MARSHALL, LA BRON

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 TD BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARSHALL, LA BRON. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellison, McKee. Alissa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2472

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ellison, McKee. Alissa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD BANK, N.A.

4600 Touchton Rd E Suite 400

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Defendants

MARSHALL, LINDA HENDERSON

Tampa, FL 33610

MARSHALL, LA BRON

Tampa, FL 33610

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS , THOMAS LEE

Attorney at HODGES, AVRUTIS & FOELLER

Avrutis & Foeller Pa Dba Po Box 4137

Sarasota, FL 34230

Defendant Attorney

BORELL , ALEXANDER EDWARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALEXANDER E. BORELL

319 Clematis St Ste 200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

08/28/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/17/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/02/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

04/02/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/11/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/10/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/10/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/10/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/10/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: PLTFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - 12/19/19 @ 2:45PM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketORDER ON; Comment: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING **GRANTED**; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.; Date 2: 07/18/2019; Judicial Officer: Ellison, Alissa McKee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 12/12/19; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF; Comment: DEFAULT AND DAMAGES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: MARSHALL, LA BRON; Defendant: MARSHALL, LINDA HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: MARSHALL, LA BRON; Defendant: MARSHALL, LINDA HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: MARSHALL, LA BRON; Defendant: MARSHALL, LINDA HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TD BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019379166; Judge: Ellison, Alissa McKee

    Read MoreRead Less