This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/01/2021 at 10:52:22 (UTC).

Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc,Whitmore, Aaron vs Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Tampa Sports Wellness Chiropractic, Llc,Whitmore, Aaron filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Perrone, M. Frances and Perrone, Frances. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5040

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Perrone, M. Frances

Perrone, Frances. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc A/A/O Aaron Whitmore

1430 20Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

1430 20Th Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33704

Whitmore, Aaron

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN , DEREK WILLIAM

Attorney at BERNSTEIN LAW

1430 20Th Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33704

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/20/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/20/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: FOR DEFAULT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc; Plaintiff: Whitmore, Aaron

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Sports & Wellness Chiropractic, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAMPA SPORTS & WELLNESS CHIROPRACTIC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEREK W BERNSTEIN, ESQ