This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2023 at 12:36:33 (UTC).

TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC,RUEDA, MONICA MARRERO vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC,RUEDA, MONICA MARRERO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8091

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUEDA, MONICA MARRERO

TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIGORI , KEITH PATRICK

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/08/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/08/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/08/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/08/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/08/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/08/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/08/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/15/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/15/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/06/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023078715; Judge: Judge, Senior

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less