This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/04/2022 at 06:16:21 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC,Sheppard, Marc vs ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC SPINE LLC,Sheppard, Marc filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6745

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheppard, Marc

TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

LA MONTAGNE , RACHEL MARIE

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/01/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/02/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAMPA BAY ORTHOPAEDIC & SPINE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.