This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/20/2022 at 04:45:29 (UTC).

Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.,Guerrier, Fritz vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc ,Guerrier, Fritz filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gutman, Jack. N and Gutman, N. Jack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7422

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gutman, N. Jack

Gutman, Jack. N

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Guerrier, Fritz

Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

2409 Canopy Creek Way

Land O Lakes, FL 34639

CURA , LORIE SCHAEFER

Attorney at AMY RUIZ LAW, PL

4812 N Habana Ave

Tampa, FL 33614

Defendant Attorney

DOUMAS , JENNIFER MARIE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/25/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/25/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

08/25/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/25/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

08/26/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guerrier, Fritz; Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Neurosurgical Associates, Llc. A/A/O Tru Do is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LICZNERSKI , ALEXANDER DARIUSZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURA , LORIE SCHAEFER