This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/06/2021 at 19:31:59 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Myers, Theresa vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Myers, Theresa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C, Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael, Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2894

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC., as assignee of Theresa My

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Myers, Theresa

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, a

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

KAY , REBECCA COOPERMAN

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

1700 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Ste 800

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/13/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/13/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED TO DIVISION N PER AO S-2021-057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant