This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/18/2022 at 14:22:32 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Carpenter, Natalie vs SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Carpenter, Natalie filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, Susan. S and Lopez, S. Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7230

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carpenter, Natalie

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

GUTIERREZ, JHANELLE ODETTE

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

Employees Of Farmers Insurance Exchange Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

08/01/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/01/2022: ANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/08/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY AND OBJECTIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutierrez, Jhanelle Odette