This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/05/2022 at 05:51:43 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,BALTER, KACEY vs FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,BALTER, KACEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5128

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC., as assignee of Kacey Balt

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

BALTER, KACEY

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corp

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

EASTERLING , TAISHA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

Employees Of Farmers Insurance Exchange 2290 Lucien Way Ste 280

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/19/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/19/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/19/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/19/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/20/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/20/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/10/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/19/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Farmers Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA