Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/13/2021 at 04:49:10 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,,JOOS, DEAN vs PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,,JOOS, DEAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6176

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC, as assignee of Dean Joos

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

JOOS, DEAN

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

200 E Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

MOGG , DANIELLA

Attorney at SENTRY INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 8051

Stevens Point, WI 54481

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/15/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021267090; Judge: Bagge-Hernandez, Michael C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman