This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/08/2023 at 17:11:46 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.,BUTLER, BRIANA vs FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC ,BUTLER, BRIANA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Schultz-Kin, Leslie, Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7722

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUTLER, BRIANA

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.

Defendant

FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Defendant Attorney

CONNER , WADE THOMAS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/05/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/05/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/05/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/05/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/05/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/06/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/06/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/24/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/14/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO STRIKE

09/16/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE

11/15/2022: NOTICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

11/29/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/01/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023043971; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.; Private Attorney: FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: & DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: FARMERS CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corporation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less