This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 10:28:50 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Gilbert, Benette vs SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Gilbert, Benette filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7325

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC., as assignee of Benette Gi

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Gilbert, Benette

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendants

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, a foreign corpo

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

JONES , PHILLIP THOMAS

Attorney at VERNIS & BOWLING OF THE GULF COAST, P.A.

2203 N Lois Ave Ste 711

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/01/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/01/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/01/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/01/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/05/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/05/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/25/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/01/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: JONES , PHILLIP THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES , PHILLIP THOMAS