This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/24/2021 at 00:15:56 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Anderson, Ariel vs STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Anderson, Ariel filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Schultz-Kin, Leslie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1518

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Schultz-Kin, Leslie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC., as assignee of Ariel Ande

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Anderson, Ariel

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E. Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/05/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/05/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/05/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/07/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/07/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021594447; Judge: Schultz-Kin, Leslie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Friedman