This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 05:29:20 (UTC).

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Pirone, Antonella vs SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC,Pirone, Antonella filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6133

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pirone, Antonella

TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

JONES , PHILLIP THOMAS

Attorney at VERNIS & BOWLING OF THE GULF COAST, P.A.

2203 N Lois Ave Ste 711

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/25/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/25/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/25/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/25/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/26/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/26/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/12/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/25/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/30/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/06/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: & NOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Pirone, Antonella; Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: TAMPA BAY IMAGING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Southern-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONES , PHILLIP THOMAS