This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/14/2022 at 16:08:27 (UTC).

Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC,EMERICK, KIMBERLY vs First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2022 Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC,EMERICK, KIMBERLY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tompkins, M. Joseph and Tompkins, Joseph. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6806

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tompkins, M. Joseph

Tompkins, Joseph. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tampa Bay Imaging, Llc A/A/O Kimberly Emerick

901 Central Avenue

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

EMERICK, KIMBERLY

Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

901 Central Avenue

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendant

First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLYNN , JAMES EDWARD, Jr

Attorney at THE FLYNN LAW FIRM P.A.

901 Central Ave

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

07/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/18/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022352947; Judge: Tompkins, Joseph M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EMERICK, KIMBERLY; Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: EMERICK, KIMBERLY; Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: First Acceptance Insurance Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tampa Bay Imaging, LLC, is a litigant

Latest cases where First Acceptance Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLYNN , JAMES EDWARD, Jr