This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/03/2021 at 11:19:03 (UTC).

Tampa Bay Imaging,TAYON, LINDA vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 Tampa Bay Imaging,TAYON, LINDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4949

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tampa Bay Imaging A/A/O Linda Tayon

Tampa, FL 33607

Tampa Bay Imaging

Tampa, FL 33607

TAYON, LINDA

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

10/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

10/19/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021569898; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Imaging

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER