This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/08/2023 at 10:20:13 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs Holmes, Evrett

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 Synchrony Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Holmes, Evrett. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9725

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

Holmes, Evrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ESCOBEDO, PABLO JOSE

HOFFMAN , ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/28/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

09/28/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

10/06/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

11/07/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

11/10/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

11/16/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

COURT TICKET

11/16/2022: COURT TICKET

AFFIDAVIT

02/06/2023: AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Synchrony Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 305 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TICKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Holmes, Evrett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Synchrony Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Holmes, Evrett;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Synchrony Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Synchrony Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Synchrony Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Synchrony Bank;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less