This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 02:38:32 (UTC).

SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC,SURTMAN, ANDREW vs PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC,SURTMAN, ANDREW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael and Hooi, Michael. J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1797

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

SURTMAN, ANDREW

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASSELMANN-ARANA , LISA CAROELLI

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/17/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/20/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/20/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

07/22/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

07/22/2022: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022365790; Judge: Hooi, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNCOAST PHYSICAL MEDICINE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant