This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/12/2023 at 15:13:23 (UTC).

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION vs ROGERS, ASHANTI Z

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROGERS, ASHANTI Z. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, Miriam. V. and Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7542

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Defendant

ROGERS, ASHANTI Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/27/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/27/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/27/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

01/30/2023: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/15/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/10/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

03/10/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/14/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

03/27/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2023136851; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES, AFFIDAVIT OF COST AND FEES, AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM, ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: ROGERS, ASHANTI Z;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: ROGERS, ASHANTI Z;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ASHANTI Z ROGERS AKA ASHANTI ROGERS, FEBRUARY 2, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ROGERS, ASHANTI Z;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less