This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/30/2021 at 21:37:01 (UTC).

Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc vs Security National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Security National Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, James. S and Moody, S. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8609

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, James. S

Moody, S. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Milan Racak

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

RACAK, MILAN

Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

102 Poinciana Lane

Largo, FL 33770

Defendant

Security National Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THIBODEAUX , CHRISTOPHER YVES

Attorney at UNITED LAW GROUP OF FLORIDA

1920 West Bay Dr Ste 1

Largo, FL 33770

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Attorney at VASILAROS LAW LLC

111 Bayside Dr

Clearwater Beach, FL 33767

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

08/20/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/19/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

08/19/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: RACAK, MILAN; Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Security National Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Suncoast Auto Glass, Llc A/A/O Priscilla Howard is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THIBODEAUX CHRISTOPHER Y