Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/16/2021 at 10:41:24 (UTC).

SUMPTER, ALBERT A vs ROMAN, ANDREA C

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 SUMPTER, ALBERT A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROMAN, ANDREA C. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1416

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMPTER, ALBERT A

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

ROMAN, ANDREA C

Lutz, FL 33549

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROMER , CHELSEA BROOKE

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

One Tampa City Center 201 N Franklin St

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

SCHEELE , BRANDON ROBERT

Attorney at BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/06/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/18/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/17/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/17/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

02/17/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/17/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: ROMAN, ANDREA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: ROMAN, ANDREA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: ROMAN, ANDREA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMPTER, ALBERT A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHEELE, BRANDON