This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/17/2021 at 17:59:36 (UTC).

SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC vs KIMBROUGH, SHEQUANDA RODMIKA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against KIMBROUGH, SHEQUANDA RODMIKA. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Manning, M. Daryl, Manning, Daryl. M, Scott, M. Monique and Scott, Monique. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4043

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Manning, M. Daryl

Manning, Daryl. M

Scott, M. Monique

Scott, Monique. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION IN

2111 W Swann Ave Suite 204

Tampa, FL 33606

SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

2111 W Swann Ave Suite 204

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant

KIMBROUGH, SHEQUANDA RODMIKA

Riverview, FL 33579

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAZIER , NATHAN A

Attorney at FRAZIER & BOWLES, ATTORNEYS AT LAW

Nathan A Frazier, Frazier & Bowles 202 S Rome Ave Ste 125

Tampa, FL 33606

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

11/25/2020: NOTICE

LIS PENDENS

11/25/2020: LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

12/23/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

12/03/2020: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

11/25/2020: LIS PENDENS

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/03/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/25/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/25/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: VDRLPJ; Judgment Description: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens; Instrument Number: 2021044755; Judge: Scott, Monique M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal and Release of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SHEQUANDA KIMBROUGH. 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: KIMBROUGH, SHEQUANDA RODMIKA; Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: KIMBROUGH, SHEQUANDA RODMIKA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMMERWOOD OF OAK CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION IN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATHAN FRAZIER