This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/08/2021 at 03:32:51 (UTC).

Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.,HIBBERT, MATTHEW vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Stout Family Chiropractic, P A ,HIBBERT, MATTHEW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Ober, Ann. Joelle and Ober, Joelle. Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6996

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Ober, Ann. Joelle

Ober, Joelle. Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A. A/A/O Matthew Hibbert

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

HIBBERT, MATTHEW

Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/17/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/14/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021367606; Judge: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STOUT FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC PA is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER