Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/30/2021 at 00:47:11 (UTC).

Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.,SALAS, EDDIE vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Stout Family Chiropractic, P A ,SALAS, EDDIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6698

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A. A/A/O Eddie Salas

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

SALAS, EDDIE

Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

3705 North Himes Avenue

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

PAFITES , ANDREW JOSEPH GEORGE, Jr

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DAVID S. DOUGHERTY

4300 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/27/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/16/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/11/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/11/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Stout Family Chiropractic, P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STOUT FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC PA is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KINCER , BENJAMIN ALEXANDER