This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/05/2022 at 10:04:46 (UTC).

STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC vs USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lopez, Susan. S and Lopez, S. Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6620

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lopez, S. Susan

Lopez, Susan. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cook, Chelsea

STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

WAINORIS , RANDALL A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT D. TETREAULT

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 550

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/26/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/26/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/26/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/24/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/30/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELIOS SPINE AND HEALTH, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAINORIS RANDALL A