This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 20:54:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN vs ZONATA, JOHN

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZONATA, JOHN. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7200

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF FLORIDA

Tallahassee, FL 32399

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Defendants

ZONATA, JOHN

Tampa, FL 33602

ATANOZS GROUP 46

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINACCI , DAVID KENNETH

Attorney at MANAUSA, SHAW & MINACCI, P.A.

140 W 1St St

Saint George Island, FL 32328

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/07/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/07/2021: COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

09/07/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

09/07/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/07/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/17/2021: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

11/01/2021: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

11/01/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/07/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

11/03/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

11/01/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/07/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

10/07/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/09/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

09/09/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: VIA ZOOM - 03/02/2022 @900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: ATANOZS GROUP 46; Defendant: ZONATA, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: ATANOZS GROUP 46; Defendant: ZONATA, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JOHN ZONATA 10/2/2021 SUBSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ATANOZS GROUP 46. C/O JOHN ZONATA 10/2/2021 CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONAL REGULATION, BOARD OF ARCHITECTURE AND INTERIOR DESIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David K Minacci