This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/16/2023 at 21:52:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION vs ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANYet al,

Case Summary

On 03/02/2023 STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bauman, Robert. A., Bauman, A.. Robert, Tesche Arkin, Caroline and Bauman, Robert A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1881

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bauman, Robert. A.

Bauman, A.. Robert

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

Bauman, Robert A.

 

Party Details

Defendants

AMERIS BANK

Hillsborough County Tax Collector

Memic Indemnity Company

Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation

50 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMALL , JAY WILLIAM

SHARMA , PRINEET D

 

Court Documents

E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2023: E-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

07/31/2023: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

07/13/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING

WAIVER

07/07/2023: WAIVER

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

08/01/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

NOTICE

05/11/2023: NOTICE

LETTER TO CLERK FROM

08/01/2023: LETTER TO CLERK FROM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/02/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

07/20/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 502View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 11:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/92333190791 MEETING ID: 923 3319 0791; Judicial Officer: Bauman, Robert A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME; Additional Info: Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Private Attorney: SMALL , JAY WILLIAM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Comment: ST. PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Comment: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE; Comment: TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE OF SUIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: FDOT - WAIVER REQUEST; Additional Info: Plaintiff: STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: WAIVER REQUEST UNDER FLA. STAT. 28.345

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: AMERIS BANK; Defendant: BIOCARE MEDICAL DEVICES, LLC; Defendant: DENTALWORKS USA, LLC; Defendant: EAST BAY CONSULTING, INC; Defendant: FRONTIER FLORIDA, LLC; Defendant: GOLDEN STAR DIAMONDS L.L.C.; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: HUNTINGTON INGALLS INC; Defendant: IMAGENET, LLC; Defendant: Jacobs Technology. INC; Defendant: JAYSON, FARTHING & SKAFIDAS, P.A.; Defendant: MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC; Defendant: Memic Indemnity Company; Defendant: MOSS & ASSOCIATES, LLC; Defendant: MYM Solutions, INC; Defendant: NBC Securities, INC.; Defendant: Nebraska Medical Solutions, L.L.C.; Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation; Defendant: Office Evolution Tampa, LLC; Defendant: Omni Wealth Advisors, INC; Defendant: Pacira Pharmaceuticals, INC; Defendant: Penske Automotive Group, INC; Defendant: Peraton, INC; Defendant: Primeco Personal Communications, L.P.; Defendant: Redstone Commercial, LLC; Defendant: Spathe Systems, LLC; Defendant: ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY; Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC; Defendant: VINCENT M. LUCENTE & ASSOCIATES, INC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less