This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/26/2022 at 17:16:58 (UTC).

State of Florida Department of Transportation vs Murray, F. Leo, IIIet al,

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 State of Florida Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Murray, F Leo, III,. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, L. Paul, Huey, Paul L and Huey, Paul. L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4611

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, L. Paul

Huey, Paul L

Huey, Paul. L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Florida Department of Transportation

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendants

Hillsborough County Tax Collector

Tampa, FL 33602

Murray, F. Leo, III

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Murray, Justin

Tampa, FL 33619

Florida Lighting and Signs, Inc., a Florida corporation

5945 Florida Avenue

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALOYMA M

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

11201 Mckinley Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant Attorneys

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

SIMON , BRENT EVAN

Attorney at BRENT SIMON LAW GROUP

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652-2330

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/01/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

01/18/2022: STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

JOINT MOTION

01/18/2022: JOINT MOTION

AMENDED ORDER

01/11/2022: AMENDED ORDER

MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

12/30/2021: MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

NOTICE

12/14/2021: NOTICE

CERTIFICATE OF

11/17/2021: CERTIFICATE OF

NOTICE

11/16/2021: NOTICE

STIPULATED ORDER

11/05/2021: STIPULATED ORDER

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: QUITCLAIM DEEDS & WARRANTY DEEDS ATTCHD; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: SFJ; Judgment Description: STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022056100; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER; Comment: AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER FOR MEDIATION ON 12/15/21 AT 9:00 AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Lighting and Signs, Inc., a Florida corporation; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: Murray, F. Leo, III; Defendant: Murray, Justin; Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation; Private Attorney: FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS; Private Attorney: SANCHEZ , ALOYMA M; Private Attorney: SIMON , BRENT EVAN; Date 2: 01/11/2022; Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/7196320493 MEETING ID 791 632 0493TELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME ACCESS CODE AS ZOOM Judicial Officer: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Lighting and Signs, Inc., a Florida corporation; Defendant: Murray, F. Leo, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY; Additional Info: Defendant: Florida Lighting and Signs, Inc., a Florida corporation; Defendant: Murray, F. Leo, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less