This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/25/2023 at 06:29:20 (UTC).

State of Florida Department of Transportation vs LAUREL STREET COMMERCE CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.et al,

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 State of Florida Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against LAUREL STREET COMMERCE CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC ,. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4881

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Defendants

ATROX PARTNERS PLLC

5650 First Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33710

BRN DEVELOPMENT LLC

5001 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

BUBBA BEAN'S IRON WORKS LLC

5001 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

CENTENNIAL BANK

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

CETAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC

One Independence Drive Suite 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

COMPUTER SUPPORT PRODUCTS INC

5650 First Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33710

CWU INC

One Independence Drive Suite 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

DARR, MICHELLE

Tampa, FL 33607

DARR, STEPHEN P

Tampa, FL 33607

DIRECT TELECOM INC.

5001 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

DONNA'S DEVOTED HEALTH CARE LLC

3637 Fourth St N 101

St Petersburg, FL 33704

FLORIDA BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

319 Clematis St Suite 109

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

FLORIDA FIRST CAPITAL FINANCE CORPORATION INC

1351 N Gadsen Street

Tallahassee, FL 32303

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Tampa, FL 33602

INFRASTRUCTURE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS INC

5650 First Avenue North

St Petersburg, FL 33710

JOY USA LLC

1200 South Pine Island Drive

Plantation, FL 33324

KEVIN W RICHARDSON PLLC

Jacksonville, FL 32210

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DIAZ , ANDREW GERALD

Attorney at GAYLORD MERLIN LUDOVICI & DIAZ

5001 W Cypress St

Tampa, FL 33607

MEADOWS , BRANDON CLARK

Attorney at JIMERSON BIRR, P.A..

1 Independent Dr Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

MILLS , CHRISTOPHER YOUNG

Attorney at BUSCH, MILLS & SLOMKA, LLP

701 S Olive Ave Ste 105

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

Other Attorneys

SMALL , JAY WILLIAM

Attorney at MATEER & HARBERT, P.A.

225 E Robinson St Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

DEYOUNG , DONALD TOBYN

Attorney at THE DEYOUNG FIRM PA

5650 1St Ave N

St Petersburg, FL 33710

LEACH, SPENCER DEVIN

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON

100 Se 3Rd Ave Ste 1620

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394-0002

CADLE, IVY

THOMPSON , STEVEN FLETCHER

Attorney at THOMPSON COMMERCIAL LAW GROUP

615 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

POWELL , GEORGE WASHINGTON, Jr

Attorney at AKERMAN LLP

801 Laurel Oak Dr Ste 401

Naples, FL 34108

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION AND MOTION

01/23/2023: OBJECTION AND MOTION

STATUS REPORT

01/23/2023: STATUS REPORT

ORDER

01/23/2023: ORDER

EMINENT DOMAIN REGISTRY DEPOSIT

01/20/2023: EMINENT DOMAIN REGISTRY DEPOSIT

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT

01/20/2023: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT

CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT

01/20/2023: CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT

EMINENT DOMAIN REGISTRY DEPOSIT

01/20/2023: EMINENT DOMAIN REGISTRY DEPOSIT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/18/2023: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON

01/18/2023: ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/13/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/13/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/13/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/13/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/13/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

LETTER FROM CLERK

01/13/2023: LETTER FROM CLERK

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/13/2023: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER

01/12/2023: ORDER

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

01/12/2023: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

411 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 501View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION AND MOTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LAUREL STREET COMMERCE CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation; Private Attorney: SMALL , JAY WILLIAM;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES 02/03/23 AT 10:00 AM 01/23/23 RMB; Additional Info: Defendant: ATROX PARTNERS PLLC; Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION; Defendant: BANK OZK; Defendant: BRN DEVELOPMENT LLC; Defendant: BUBBA BEAN'S IRON WORKS LLC; Defendant: CENTENNIAL BANK; Defendant: CETAN PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC; Defendant: COMPUTER SUPPORT PRODUCTS INC; Defendant: CWU INC; Defendant: DARBY JONES REALTY, LLC; Defendant: DARR, MICHELLE; Defendant: DARR, STEPHEN P; Defendant: DIRECT TELECOM INC.; Defendant: DONNA'S DEVOTED HEALTH CARE LLC; Defendant: FLORIDA BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION; Defendant: FLORIDA FIRST CAPITAL FINANCE CORPORATION INC; Defendant: HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR; Defendant: INFRASTRUCTURE MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS INC; Defendant: JOY USA LLC; Defendant: KEVIN W RICHARDSON PLLC; Defendant: KV DIRECT INC; Defendant: KV DIRECT, INC.; Defendant: LAUREL STREET COMMERCE CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.; Defendant: LTJ GROUP HOLDINGS LLC; Defendant: LTJ GROUP V LLC; Defendant: LTJ GROUP V, L.L.C.; Defendant: LUSTERLINE INC; Defendant: MACIEL, FRANCISCO; Defendant: MICHIGAN MUTUAL INC.; Defendant: NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS PCS LLC; Defendant: OUTDOOR MEDIA INC.; Defendant: PILOT BANK; Defendant: PJL INVESTMENTS LLC; Defendant: PROFESSIONAL FIDUCIARY SERVICES LLC; Defendant: RALK INVESTMENTS LLC; Defendant: RAM SOLUTIONS LLC; Defendant: REGIONS BANK; Defendant: SALT SOLUTIONS INC.; Defendant: SAVYTEEG LLC; Defendant: SCHREIBER-HEIDT HOLDINGS II, LLC; Defendant: SOUTH STATE BANK, N.A.; Defendant: STILLO & RICHARDSON PA; Defendant: STILLO RICHARDSON REALTY GROUP LLC; Defendant: SYNOVUS BANK; Defendant: TAMPA BAY HEALTH INSURANCE ADVISORS LLC; Defendant: TENEX SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS INC.; Defendant: THE BANK OF TAMPA; Defendant: THE CORE GROUP INC; Defendant: TOKORIKI PROPERTIES LLC; Defendant: TRIDENT DESIGNS LLC; Defendant: TRUIST BANK; Defendant: UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION; Defendant: USA EXTERIOR LLC; Defendant: USHEALTH ADVISORS LLC; Defendant: VIVID LOGIC LLC; Defendant: WAGNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY LLC; Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Intervenor: Trident Automotive Group, LLC; Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation; Private Attorney: DEYOUNG , DONALD TOBYN; Private Attorney: DIAZ , ANDREW GERALD; Private Attorney: FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS; Private Attorney: MEADOWS , BRANDON CLARK; Private Attorney: MILLS , CHRISTOPHER YOUNG; Private Attorney: POWELL , GEORGE WASHINGTON, Jr; Private Attorney: SMALL , JAY WILLIAM; Private Attorney: THOMPSON , STEVEN FLETCHER; Pro Hac Vice Attorney: CADLE, IVY; Date 2: 01/23/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMINENT DOMAIN REGISTRY DEPOSIT; Comment: $3,301,420.00 PARCEL #503; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT; Comment: $3,301,420.00 PARCEL #503; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT; Comment: $9,438,680 PARCEL 500,502,505; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMINENT DOMAIN REGISTRY DEPOSIT; Comment: $9,438,680 PARCEL 500,502,505; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: LAUREL STREET COMMERCE CENTER CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
493 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: JENNIFER M. MOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida First Capital Finance Corp Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Florida Business Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTENNIAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMALL JAY W