This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 10:23:30 (UTC).

State of Florida Department of Transportation vs KSM Investment Group LLCet al,

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 State of Florida Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against KSM Investment Group LLC,. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Huey, Paul. L, Huey, Paul L and Huey, L. Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5815

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Huey, Paul. L

Huey, Paul L

Huey, L. Paul

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Florida Department of Transportation

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendants

6120 Broadway Ave LLC

4406 W Bird St

Tampa, FL 33614

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES THAT MAY HAVE AN INTEREST IN PARCEL 105

Aspiro Tires LLC

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Hillsborough County Tax Collector

Tampa, FL 33619

JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA

1200 S Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

KSM Investment Group LLC

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALOYMA M

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

11201 Mckinley Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant Attorneys

SIMON , BRENT EVAN

Attorney at BRENT SIMON LAW GROUP

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652-2330

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/15/2021: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/15/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/15/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/15/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/01/2022: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

Disclaimer of Interest

05/16/2022: Disclaimer of Interest

STIPULATION

03/28/2022: STIPULATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/01/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE

02/16/2022: NOTICE

CERTIFICATE OF

02/10/2022: CERTIFICATE OF

NOTICE

02/10/2022: NOTICE

ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/01/2022: ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

JOINT MOTION

01/27/2022: JOINT MOTION

ORDER

01/14/2022: ORDER

JOINT MOTION

01/10/2022: JOINT MOTION

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer of Interest; Additional Info: Defendant: 6120 Broadway Ave LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: SFJ; Judgment Description: STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022168159; Judge: Huey, Paul L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING MARCH 2, 2022; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING MARCH 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF EXCHANGE; Additional Info: Defendant: KSM Investment Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Additional Info: Defendant: 6120 Broadway Ave LLC; Defendant: KSM Investment Group LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF EXCHANGE OF APPRAISAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ALOYMA SANCHEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE); Additional Info: Defendant: 6120 Broadway Ave LLC; Defendant: ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES THAT MAY HAVE AN INTEREST IN PARCEL 105; Defendant: Aspiro Tires LLC; Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector; Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA; Defendant: KSM Investment Group LLC; Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less