This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 05:55:03 (UTC).

State of Florida Department of Transportation vs Jones, Billie Fet al,

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 State of Florida Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Jones, Billie F. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher. C., Nash, C.. Christopher and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4576

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Florida Department of Transportation

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendants

BMJ Enterprises LLC

5945 Florida Avenue

New Port Richey,, FL 34652

Hillsborough County Tax Collector

Tampa, FL 33619

Jones, Billie F

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Jones, Murel Lee

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Unknown Parties That May Have an Interest in Parcel 108

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALOYMA M

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

11201 Mckinley Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant Attorneys

SIMON , BRENT EVAN

Attorney at BRENT SIMON LAW GROUP

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652-2330

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/03/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

06/03/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

06/03/2021: COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE

06/25/2021: SUMMONS TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE

06/25/2021: SUMMONS TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/24/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/07/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

STIPULATED ORDER

01/17/2022: STIPULATED ORDER

JOINT MOTION

01/11/2022: JOINT MOTION

MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

12/30/2021: MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

STIPULATED ORDER

12/16/2021: STIPULATED ORDER

CERTIFICATE OF

12/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF

JOINT STIPULATION

12/10/2021: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

11/19/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

11/05/2021: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE

10/07/2021: NOTICE

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: SFJ; Judgment Description: STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2022056064; Judge: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER; Comment: AMENDED / FOR MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 01/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATED ORDER; Comment: FOR MEDIATION; Additional Info: Date Signed: 12/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Additional Info: Defendant: BMJ Enterprises LLC; Defendant: Jones, Billie F; Defendant: Jones, Murel Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204 Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW GOOD FAITH ESTIMATE AS STATED HEREIN // SENT TO ACCT'G - SED; Additional Info: Defendant: Jones, Billie F; Defendant: Jones, Murel Lee; Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation; Date Signed: 11/19/2021; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Comment: ATTY RE: WAIVED FILING FEES UNDER FLA. STAT. 28.345; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ, ALOYMA M