This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/09/2021 at 21:22:54 (UTC).

State of Florida Department of Transportation vs Johnson Tire & Salvage, Inc.et al,

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 State of Florida Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Johnson Tire Salvage, Inc . This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily, Peacock, Emily A and Peacock, Emily. A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5238

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily A

Peacock, Emily. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State of Florida Department of Transportation

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendants

Florida Group Ventures, LLC

17764 Espirit Dr.

Tampa, FL 33647

Hillsborough County Tax Collector

Tampa, FL 33602

Johnson Tire & Salvage, Inc., a Florida corp.

5945 Florida Avenue

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Truist Bank, f/k/a Suntrust Bank

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES THAT MAY HAVE AN INTEREST IN PARCEL 109

Johnson Tire & Salvage, Inc.

5945 Florida Avenue

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Truist Bank

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ , ALOYMA M

Attorney at FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

11201 Mckinley Dr

Tampa, FL 33612

Defendant Attorneys

FITZGERALD , BRIAN THOMAS

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEYS OFFICE

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

SIMON , BRENT EVAN

Attorney at BRENT SIMON LAW GROUP

5945 Florida Ave

New Port Richey, FL 34652-2330

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

06/25/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/25/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS

06/25/2021: LIS PENDENS

DECLARATION OF TAKING

06/25/2021: DECLARATION OF TAKING

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/27/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

06/27/2021: LIS PENDENS (RECORDABLE)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/23/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER

08/03/2021: ANSWER

ANSWER

08/03/2021: ANSWER

RESPONSE

08/02/2021: RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

09/21/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

CERTIFICATE OF

09/14/2021: CERTIFICATE OF

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

09/01/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/30/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

08/16/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF EXCHANGE; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson Tire & Salvage, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODF; Judgment Description: ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS; Judge: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2021
  • DocketORDER DISBURSING FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: OF TAXES DUE AND MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF REAL ESTATE TAX AND DROPPIN HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR AS A PARY AS TO PARCEL 109; Additional Info: Defendant: Hillsborough County Tax Collector

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: WITHDRAW GOOD FAITH ESTIMATE AS STATED HEREIN; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson Tire & Salvage, Inc.; Date Signed: 09/30/2021; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: TO DEFENDANT JOHNSON TIRE & SALVAGE, INC. S MOTION TO ALLOW DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEVIDENCE DATA SHEET; Comment: EDS# 211181

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: MOTION TO WITHDRAW GOOD FAITH ESTIMATE 9/30/2021 @10:00AM; Additional Info: Defendant: Johnson Tire & Salvage, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TAKING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: State of Florida Department of Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: ALOYMA M. SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truist Bank f/k/a Suntrust Bank d/b/a Lighstream is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ, ALOYMA M